NY S07129 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-16 - SIGNED CHAP.226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Greenburgh North Castle Union free school district to lease certain real property and establishes that the Greenburgh North Castle Union Free School District 12 and St. Christopher's Inc. are "private not-for-profit schools".
Title
Authorizes Greenburgh North Castle Union free school district to lease certain real property and establishes that the Greenburgh North Castle Union Free School District 12 and St. Christopher's Inc. are "private not-for-profit schools".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-16 | SIGNED CHAP.226 | |
2010-07-13 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-15 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-15 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-15 | ordered to third reading rules cal.149 | |
2010-06-15 | substituted for a10272b | |
2010-05-03 | referred to education | |
2010-05-03 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-05-03 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-04-26 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7129B | |
2010-04-19 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7129A | |
2010-03-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-03-25 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-03-24 | 1ST REPORT CAL.315 | |
2010-03-15 | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10272 (Same As) 2010-06-15 - substituted by s7129b