NY A10256 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition of any charge or fee on the telephone bill of a consumer when such fee or charge is imposed by a third party, unless the consumer explicitly agrees to the nature and amount of such fee or charge; makes the unauthorized imposition of such a fee void and unenforceable; directs the public service commission to enforce such provisions.
Title
Prohibits the imposition of any charge or fee on the telephone bill of a consumer when such fee or charge is imposed by a third party, unless the consumer explicitly agrees to the nature and amount of such fee or charge; makes the unauthorized imposition of such a fee void and unenforceable; directs the public service commission to enforce such provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.252 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.252 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |