NY A10253 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.333
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to subpoenas in proceedings before the public employment relations board; relates to exclusions from article 23 of the civil practice law and rules.
Title
Relates to subpoenas in proceedings before the public employment relations board; relates to exclusions from article 23 of the civil practice law and rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.333 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1078 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7396 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.250 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.250 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07396 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10253