NY A10203 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes absentee voting; defines the term "illness" for the purposes of absentee voting to include the spread or potential spread of any communicable disease, at a time of declaration of a state of emergency within the jurisdiction where the election is taking place.
Title
Authorizes absentee voting; defines the term "illness" for the purposes of absentee voting to include the spread or potential spread of any communicable disease, at a time of declaration of a state of emergency within the jurisdiction where the election is taking place.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-03-27 | Assembly | print number 10203a |
2020-03-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to election law |
2020-03-24 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S08015 (Same As) 2020-08-20 - APPROVAL MEMO.4