NY A10170 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s7345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-08 - substituted by s7345
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions related to licensing of establishments where animals or fowls are slaughtered.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions related to licensing of establishments where animals or fowls are slaughtered.
Sponsors
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Michele Titus [D] |
Asm. Annette Robinson [D] | Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted by s7345 |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.872 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S07345 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.207