NY A10136 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s6906
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s6906
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notice provisions in public works contracts; requires any contract made and awarded by a public owner for any public work project to contain, or be presumed to contain, the following: "The failure to give any notice required to be given by such contract within the time prescribed therein shall not invalidate any claim made by the contractor or any other claimant, unless the failure to provide timely notice has materially prejudiced the public owner"; requires a showing of material prejudice.
Title
Relates to notice provisions in public works contracts; requires any contract made and awarded by a public owner for any public work project to contain, or be presumed to contain, the following: "The failure to give any notice required to be given by such contract within the time prescribed therein shall not invalidate any claim made by the contractor or any other claimant, unless the failure to provide timely notice has materially prejudiced the public owner"; requires a showing of material prejudice.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s6906 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.543 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06906 (Same As) 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.304