NY S06906 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - VETOED MEMO.304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to notice provisions in public works contracts; requires any contract made and awarded by a public owner for any public work project to contain, or be presumed to contain, the following: "The failure to give any notice required to be given by such contract within the time prescribed therein shall not invalidate any claim made by the contractor or any other claimant, unless the failure to provide timely notice has materially prejudiced the public owner"; requires a showing of material prejudice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to notice provisions in public works contracts; requires any contract made and awarded by a public owner for any public work project to contain, or be presumed to contain, the following: "The failure to give any notice required to be given by such contract within the time prescribed therein shall not invalidate any claim made by the contractor or any other claimant, unless the failure to provide timely notice has materially prejudiced the public owner"; requires a showing of material prejudice.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-31AssemblyVETOED MEMO.304
2016-12-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2016-06-17Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-06-17Assemblypassed assembly
2016-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.543
2016-06-17Assemblysubstituted for a10136
2016-06-06Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2016-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2016-05-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2016-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.722
2016-03-04SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10136 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s6906

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback