NY A10135 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the eligibility for participation in the brownfield cleanup program; makes appropriation therefor.
Title
Relates to the eligibility for participation in the brownfield cleanup program; makes appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-29 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-29 | Senate | vetoed memo.578 |
2014-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1588 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7878 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.520 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.520 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07878 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10135