NY A10132 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to traffic-control signal indications in the city of White Plains; extends provisions.
Title
Relates to traffic-control signal indications in the city of White Plains; extends provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-03 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1373 |
2024-06-03 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9237 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | home rule request |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.287 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.287 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-07 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S09237 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10132