NY A10109 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.140
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage blackfish until December 31, 2019.
Title
Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to manage blackfish until December 31, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.140 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1339 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7262 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.864 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07262 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10109