NY A10105 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to electronic filing with the state board of elections of copies of political communications.
Title
Relates to electronic filing with the state board of elections of copies of political communications.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.139 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.735 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7090 |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.91 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.91 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07090 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10105