NY A10076 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-22 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Sets limits on severance packages equal to three months salary for public at-will employees not subject to a collective bargaining agreement or union contract.
Title
Sets limits on severance packages equal to three months salary for public at-will employees not subject to a collective bargaining agreement or union contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.887 |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |