NY A10067 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8845a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s8845a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Highland Falls, in Orange county to adopt and amend local laws imposing a tax on persons occupying a room for hire in any hotel in an amount not to exceed 5% of the per diem rental rate for each room; provides for the expiration and repeal of such provisions on December 31, 2025.
Title
Authorizes the village of Highland Falls, in Orange county to adopt and amend local laws imposing a tax on persons occupying a room for hire in any hotel in an amount not to exceed 5% of the per diem rental rate for each room; provides for the expiration and repeal of such provisions on December 31, 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s8845a |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.735 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S08845 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.459