NY A10051 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s7861a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - substituted by s7861a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Rock Community Church, Inc. for all of the 2023 general taxes and all of the 2022-2023 school taxes.
Title
Authorizes the county of Nassau assessor to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from Rock Community Church, Inc. for all of the 2023 general taxes and all of the 2022-2023 school taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s7861a |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.361 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.361 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | print number 10051a |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07861 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - returned to senate