NY A10020 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s7307a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - substituted by s7307a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates restrictions on the removal of human remains from the county in which the death occurred.
Title
Eliminates restrictions on the removal of human remains from the county in which the death occurred.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s7307a |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.523 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-06-03 | Assembly | print number 10020a |
2016-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07307 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.378