NY S07307 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.378
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.378
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates restrictions on the removal of human remains from the county in which the death occurred.
Title
Eliminates restrictions on the removal of human remains from the county in which the death occurred.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.378 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.523 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a10020a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1739 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7307A |
2016-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10020 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - substituted by s7307a