NY A10014 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants Kevin Moriarty Tier IV status in the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Title
Grants Kevin Moriarty Tier IV status in the New York state teachers' retirement system.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.254 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2001 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7491A |
2016-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.522 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.522 |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | print number 10014a |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07491 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10014A