NY A09957 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "comprehensive contraception coverage act" to provide insurance coverage for FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and products.
Title
Enacts the "comprehensive contraception coverage act" to provide insurance coverage for FDA-approved contraceptive drugs, devices and products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 101 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.11 |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.11 |
2018-03-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-03-01 | Assembly | referred to insurance |