NY A09943 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals provisions relating to the transition of the school tax relief property tax exemption to a personal income tax credit.
Title
Repeals provisions relating to the transition of the school tax relief property tax exemption to a personal income tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07531 (Same As) 2016-05-09 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT