NY A09927 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - signed chap.73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to making an appropriation to pay Thomas M. Clark Jr., widower of the late Barbara M. Clark, member of the assembly from the thirty-third assembly district, the balance due of her unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to making an appropriation to pay Thomas M. Clark Jr., widower of the late Barbara M. Clark, member of the assembly from the thirty-third assembly district, the balance due of her unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25Senatesigned chap.73
2018-06-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1628
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7789
2018-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1025
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-02-23Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07789 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9927

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback