NY A09864 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS
Pending: Senate Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a commission on Lake Placid and a partner municipality hosting the olympic games.
Title
Establishes a commission on Lake Placid and a partner municipality hosting the olympic games.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.428 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.428 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | print number 9864b |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | print number 9864a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S09319 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS