NY A09821 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - approval memo.11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires curriculum related to human trafficking awareness to be included in alcohol training awareness programs; requires such training to be developed in conjunction with and approved by the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking.
Title
Requires curriculum related to human trafficking awareness to be included in alcohol training awareness programs; requires such training to be developed in conjunction with and approved by the New York state interagency task force on human trafficking.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Assembly | approval memo.11 |
2022-07-20 | Assembly | signed chap.392 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.796 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7360 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.580 |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07360 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9821