NY A09819 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.425
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.425
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Syracuse regional airport authority to provide and maintain an authority police department and a uniformed authority police force.
Title
Authorizes the Syracuse regional airport authority to provide and maintain an authority police department and a uniformed authority police force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Assembly | signed chap.425 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1675 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8736A |
2022-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.246 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.246 |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 9819a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2022-04-19 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08736 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9819A