NY A09800 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Saratoga to discontinue for reforestation purposes the use of certain lands and to convey such lands.
Title
Authorizes the county of Saratoga to discontinue for reforestation purposes the use of certain lands and to convey such lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.293 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1470 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6905 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.664 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-04-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06905 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9800