NY A09788 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-27 - advanced to third reading cal.453
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of the words "government insured" or other similar language in a manner that falsely represents that reverse mortgage loans are insured, supported and sponsored by any governmental entity in any commercial, mailing, advertisement or writing relating thereto.
Title
Prohibits the use of the words "government insured" or other similar language in a manner that falsely represents that reverse mortgage loans are insured, supported and sponsored by any governmental entity in any commercial, mailing, advertisement or writing relating thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.453 |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07184 (Same As) 2020-01-22 - referred to judiciary