NY A09733 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-10 - substituted by s8409a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid and the Ironman 70.3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid and the Ironman 70.3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-10Assemblysubstituted by s8409a
2020-06-10Assemblyrules report cal.132
2020-06-10Assemblyreported
2020-06-10Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-06-08Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2020-06-06Assemblyreference changed to codes
2020-06-05Assemblyprint number 9733b
2020-06-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2020-05-22Assemblyprint number 9733a
2020-05-22Assemblyamend and recommit to higher education
2020-02-06Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S07619 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
S08409 (Same As) 2020-06-10 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09733&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09733&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09733
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09733&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09733A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09733&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09733B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09733&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09733&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1

Bill Comments

feedback