NY S08409 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.164
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid and the Ironman 70.3.
Title
Allows out of state health care professionals to perform services at the Ironman Lake Placid and the Ironman 70.3.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.164 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.132 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a9733b |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.743 |
2020-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8409A |
2020-06-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09733 (Same As) 2020-08-24 - SIGNED CHAP.164