NY A09729 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - signed chap.139
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the shift between classes of taxable property in the town of Orangetown, county of Rockland.
Title
Limits the shift between classes of taxable property in the town of Orangetown, county of Rockland.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.139 |
2018-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-06-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1799 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7990 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.960 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-02-02 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07990 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9729