NY A09700 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-21 - signed chap.421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Van Etten, county of Chemung, to be a nonresident of such town.
Title
Authorizes the town justice of the town of Van Etten, county of Chemung, to be a nonresident of such town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-21 | Assembly | signed chap.421 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1780 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8551 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.357 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.357 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08551 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9700