NY A09684 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to local solid waste management plans; requires such plans to include methods to increase waste diversion.
Title
Relates to local solid waste management plans; requires such plans to include methods to increase waste diversion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-07-14 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.290 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.290 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08071 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION