NY A09666 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - signed chap.504
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates security services officers of the University of Rochester as peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates security services officers of the University of Rochester as peace officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senatesigned chap.504
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.1090
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6249B
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.452
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.452
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-16Assemblyprint number 9666a
2012-06-16Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2012-03-23Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S06249 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9666A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback