NY S06249 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9666A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates security services officers of the University of Rochester as peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates security services officers of the University of Rochester as peace officers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A9666A
2012-06-18SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6249B
2012-06-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-06-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-06-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1090
2012-04-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 6249A
2012-04-16SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION
2012-01-17SenateREFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A09666 (Same As) 2012-12-17 - signed chap.504

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback