NY A09648 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.439
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.439
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the acquisition of land for the erection of monuments; requires a two-thirds vote of its members to authorize change in status.
Title
Relates to the acquisition of land for the erection of monuments; requires a two-thirds vote of its members to authorize change in status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.439 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1532 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7256A |
2012-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.206 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.206 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-29 | Assembly | print number 9648a |
2012-05-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2012-03-22 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S07256 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9648A