NY A09555 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of education to change the name of the state high school equivalency diploma to the Excelsior high school diploma.
Title
Directs the commissioner of education to change the name of the state high school equivalency diploma to the Excelsior high school diploma.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | print number 9555a |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08821 (Same As) 2024-05-29 - referred to education