NY A09528 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing pharmacists to refill non-controlled substance prescriptions for quantities of drugs not to exceed a ninety day supply.
Title
Relates to authorizing pharmacists to refill non-controlled substance prescriptions for quantities of drugs not to exceed a ninety day supply.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | tabled |
2016-11-28 | Senate | vetoed memo.247 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1866 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7078A |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.71 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.71 |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | print number 9528a |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07078 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9528A