NY S07078 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9528A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9528A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing pharmacists to refill non-controlled substance prescriptions for quantities of drugs not to exceed a ninety day supply.
Title
Relates to authorizing pharmacists to refill non-controlled substance prescriptions for quantities of drugs not to exceed a ninety day supply.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9528A |
2016-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1866 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7078A |
2016-06-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09528 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - tabled