NY A09386 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - substituted by s2003
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-16 - substituted by s2003
Summary
Provides that whenever the majority of voters eligible to vote in an election district reside on a college or university campus, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such campus.
Title
Provides that whenever the majority of voters eligible to vote in an election district reside on a college or university campus, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such campus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-16 | substituted by s2003 | |
2010-04-08 | advanced to third reading cal.766 | |
2010-04-08 | reported | |
2010-01-06 | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
A3430 (Same As) 2009-06-15 - ordered to third reading rules cal.231
S2003 (Same As) 2010-06-28 - referred to election law
S2003 (Same As) 2010-06-28 - referred to election law
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09386&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |