NY S02003 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - referred to election law
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Title
Provides that whenever a contiguous property of a college or university contains three hundred or more registrants, the polling place designated for such election district shall be on such contiguous property or at a location approved by the college or university.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | referred to election law | |
2010-06-28 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-28 | REPASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-22 | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 2003A | |
2010-06-22 | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-22 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-22 | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-21 | recommitted to election law | |
2010-06-21 | substitution reconsidered | |
2010-06-16 | ordered to third reading cal.766 | |
2010-06-16 | substituted for a9386 | |
2010-06-14 | referred to election law | |
2010-06-14 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-14 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-07 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-03 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-02 | 1ST REPORT CAL.706 | |
2010-05-11 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2010-01-06 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS | |
2009-07-16 | COMMITTED TO RULES | |
2009-06-04 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-06-03 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-06-02 | 1ST REPORT CAL.565 | |
2009-05-19 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES | |
2009-02-10 | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A3430 (Same As) 2009-06-15 - ordered to third reading rules cal.231
A9386 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - substituted by s2003
A9386 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - substituted by s2003