NY A09345 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish and maintain a public website that provides information concerning specific visitation rules, regulations, policies and procedures for all correctional facilities.
Title
Directs the commissioner of corrections and community supervision to establish and maintain a public website that provides information concerning specific visitation rules, regulations, policies and procedures for all correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-05-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-04-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.435 |
2012-03-27 | Assembly | reported |
2012-03-06 | Assembly | print number 9345a |
2012-03-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to correction |
2012-02-22 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S06044 (Same As) 2012-02-24 - PRINT NUMBER 6044A