NY A09342 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - substituted by s6469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-04 - substituted by s6469
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that not-for-profit organizations shall be entitled to all prompt contracting interest due from a state agency at the time of the first payment made to any such organization.
Title
Establishes that not-for-profit organizations shall be entitled to all prompt contracting interest due from a state agency at the time of the first payment made to any such organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s6469 |
2012-06-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.702 |
2012-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-02-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06469 (Same As) 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.188