NY S06469 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.188
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes that not-for-profit organizations shall be entitled to all prompt contracting interest due from a state agency at the time of the first payment made to any such organization.
Title
Establishes that not-for-profit organizations shall be entitled to all prompt contracting interest due from a state agency at the time of the first payment made to any such organization.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.188 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.702 |
2012-06-04 | Assembly | substituted for a9342 |
2012-05-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-05-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.587 |
2012-02-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09342 (Same As) 2012-06-04 - substituted by s6469