NY A09335 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.350
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to electronic prescriptions; permits health care practitioners to make note in a patient's chart (rather than notifying the health department) when they issue a non-electronic prescription under certain conditions.
Title
Relates to electronic prescriptions; permits health care practitioners to make note in a patient's chart (rather than notifying the health department) when they issue a non-electronic prescription under certain conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.350 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.286 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6779B |
2016-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.815 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | print number 9335b |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | print number 9335a |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06779 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9335B