NY A09273 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9219b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9219b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the town of Kent, Putnam county, to lease sports field fences for advertisements with the revenues to be used solely for the care of Guglielmo Field.
Title
Permits the town of Kent, Putnam county, to lease sports field fences for advertisements with the revenues to be used solely for the care of Guglielmo Field.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s9219b |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.627 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | print number 9273b |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | print number 9273a |
2024-05-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2024-02-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S09219 (Same As) 2024-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.406