NY A09270 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - signed chap.291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-31 - signed chap.291
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.
Title
Relates to certain payments to the horsemen's organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-31 | Senate | signed chap.291 |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.237 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6684 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.556 |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-02-10 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S06684 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9270