NY A09163 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - substituted by s6332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-30 - substituted by s6332
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitted obstructions in a city with a population of one million or more; provides that such obstructions shall not include exterior wall thickness of up to 8 inches on the exterior of a building to accommodate the addition of insulation.
Title
Relates to permitted obstructions in a city with a population of one million or more; provides that such obstructions shall not include exterior wall thickness of up to 8 inches on the exterior of a building to accommodate the addition of insulation.
Sponsors
Asm. Vito Lopez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s6332 |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.651 |
2012-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-31 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S06332 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.483