NY S06332 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to permitted obstructions in a city with a population of one million or more. Provides that such obstructions shall not include exterior wall thickness of up to 8 inches on the exterior of a building to accommodate the addition of insulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to permitted obstructions in a city with a population of one million or more. Provides that such obstructions shall not include exterior wall thickness of up to 8 inches on the exterior of a building to accommodate the addition of insulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.483
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-05-30Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2012-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading cal.651
2012-05-30Assemblysubstituted for a9163
2012-03-12Assemblyreferred to housing
2012-03-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-03-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-03-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-03-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-03-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.271
2012-01-27SenateREFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT

Same As/Similar To

A09163 (Same As) 2012-05-30 - substituted by s6332

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback