NY A09043 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-21 - approval memo.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-21 - approval memo.67
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the native plant seed supply, development and enhancement program.
Title
Establishes the native plant seed supply, development and enhancement program.
Sponsors
Asm. Anna Kelles [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Sen. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Harvey Epstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-21 | Assembly | approval memo.67 |
2024-12-21 | Assembly | signed chap.630 |
2024-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-05 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1121 |
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7849 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.262 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.262 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-02-05 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S07849 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9043