NY A09040 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the elections of members to the board of education of the city school district of the city of Albany.
Title
Relates to the elections of members to the board of education of the city school district of the city of Albany.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | Senate | signed chap.236 |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-05-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.962 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7432A |
2018-03-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.720 |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | print number 9040a |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07432 (Same As) 2018-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9040A