NY S07432 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9040A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9040A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the elections of members to the board of education of the city school district of the city of Albany.
Title
Relates to the elections of members to the board of education of the city school district of the city of Albany.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9040A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.962 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7432A |
2018-03-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2018-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09040 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.236