NY A09037 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - substituted by s7278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-27 - substituted by s7278
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Lt. Cameron N. Hall Memorial Bridge; corrects the New York state bridge number.
Title
Relates to the Lt. Cameron N. Hall Memorial Bridge; corrects the New York state bridge number.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Assembly | substituted by s7278 |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.685 |
2018-02-13 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-17 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07278 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.8